EP1099320 - SPREADER FOR MULTIPLE DATA RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEGEL, Michael Eichenhainstrasse 50 D-91207 Lauf / DE | 02 /
KUKLA, Ralf Happurger Strasse 117 D-90482 Nuremberg / DE | 03 /
NOURBAKHSH, Seyed-Hami Bauernfeldstrasse 7-c D-90475 Nuremberg / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99938287.2 | 19.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP05133 | Priority number, date | DE1998132554 | 20.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832554 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005831 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099320 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099320 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/02 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H04J13/16 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPREIZER FÜR MEHRFACHE DATENRATEN | [2001/20] | English: | SPREADER FOR MULTIPLE DATA RATES | [2001/20] | French: | ETALEUR POUR DEBITS BINAIRES MULTIPLES | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 08.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2006 | BE | 01.03.2006 | CH | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | IT | 01.03.2006 | LI | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | DE | 02.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | IE | 19.07.2006 | LU | 19.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
DE | 02.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
LU | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
DE | 02.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
DE | 02.06.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
DE | 02.06.2006 | ||
IE | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
DE | 02.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10164009 ; | [A]US5442625 (GITLIN RICHARD DENNIS [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * column A * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 44 - line 62 *; | [A]WO9627250 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * page 9, line 1 - page 12, line 2 *; | [PX]WO9914878 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [PX] 1-21 * abstract * * page 8, line 9 - page 14, line 31 *; | [A] - CHIH-LIN I ET AL, "IS-95 ENHANCEMENTS FOR MULTIMEDIA SERVICES", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL,US,BELL LABORATORIES, vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1089-7089, page 60-87, XP000656006 [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * page 62, column 1, line 7 - page 63, column 2, line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2016 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10164009 A 19980619 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * |