EP1131309 - THIOPHENDIOXIMETHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAYER, Herbert Sandstrasse 66 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
GERDES, Peter Waldstrasse 75 D-52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
HEINEMANN, Ulrich Am Sonnenhang 1 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
KRÜGER, Bernd-Wieland Am Vorend 52 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
MAULER-MACHNIK, Astrid Neuenkamper Weg 46a D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 06 /
STENZEL, Klaus Seesener Strasse 17 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/37] | Application number, filing date | 99938292.2 | 20.07.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999EP05151 | Priority number, date | DE1998134830 | 01.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19834830 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0008003 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1131309 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D273/00 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C07D413/06 (EP);
A01N43/88 (EP);
C07D333/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE THIOPHENDIOXIMETHER | [2001/37] | English: | THIOPHENDIOXIMETHER | [2001/37] | French: | THIOPHENE-DIOXIMETHERS | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9504728 (BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [DY] 1-12 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seiten 41, 48, 54, 58 und 59 *; | [Y]WO9700866 (CIBA-GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-12 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seiten 26-30, 37-39, und 48 * |