EP1019769 - CONFOCAL THETA MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL ZEISS JENA GmbH Tatzendpromenade 1a 07745 Jena / DE | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELZER, Ernst, H., K. Eschelbronnerstrasse 79 D-74909 Meckesheim / DE | 02 /
STEFANY, Thomas Kurfürstenallee 22 D-69181 Leimen / DE | 03 /
LINDEK, Steffen Hinter den Dorfgärten 5-7 D-68723 Plankstadt / DE | 04 /
SWOGER, Jim Gaisbergstrasse 70-72 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH Patentabteilung Tatzendpromenade 1a 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH, Patentabteilung, Tatzendpromenade 1a 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 99938354.0 | 27.07.1999 | [2000/29] | WO1999EP05372 | Priority number, date | DE1998134279 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834279 | [2000/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007056 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019769 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019769 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G02B21/0056 (EP);
G02B21/0032 (EP);
G02B21/0072 (EP);
G02B21/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/18] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KONFOKALES THETA-MIKROSKOP | [2000/29] | English: | CONFOCAL THETA MICROSCOPE | [2000/29] | French: | MICROSCOPE THETA CONFOCAL | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9807059 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1,2,19-24 * claims 1,3,7-9 * * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5,17,18; | [YA]DE19529788 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [Y] 4,5,17,18 * column 2, line 27 - line 56 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 8; | [DX]WO9803892 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3,22-24 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure 1; claims 10-12 *; | [X]WO9705473 (MEDISPECTRA INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6,23 * page 19, line 8 - line 31; figures 2,3C *; | [X]EP0718656 (KOIKE SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,18 * abstract * * column 5, line 20 - line 38 *; | [A]DE4323129 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [A] 4,5,17,18 * abstract * | [PX] - SWOGER J ET AL, "A CONFOCAL FIBER-COUPLED SINGLE-LENS THETA MICROSCOPE", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (199808), vol. 69, no. 8, ISSN 0034-6748, page 2956-2963, XP000832276 [PX] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1149040 | [DXA] - LINDEK S ET AL, "CONFOCAL THETA MICROSCOPE WITH THREE OBJECTIVE LENSES", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (199411), vol. 65, no. 11, ISSN 0034-6748, page 3367-3372, XP000494638 [DX] 1,6,10,13 * page 3368, column L, paragraph L - page 3370, column L, paragraph 1 * [A] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1144574 | [A] - GHIGGINO K P ET AL, "FLUORESCENCE LIFETIME MEASUREMENTS USING A NOVEL FIBER-OPTIC LASER SCANNING CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 63, no. 5, ISSN 0034-6748, page 2999-3002, XP000301230 [A] 1 * page 2999; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1142599 | [A] - VOLCKER M ET AL, "MIKROSKOPGESTUTZTE FLUORESZENZ-PHOTONEN-KORRELATION", TECHNISCHES MESSEN TM,DE,R.OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 63, no. 4, ISSN 0171-8096, page 128-135, XP000584186 [A] 1,4,23 * page 130, column R - page 131 * |