EP1113748 - METHOD FOR FORMING A BIOLOGICAL STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MMTC, INC. 12 Roszel Road Suite A-203 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states MMTC, INC. 12 Roszel Road, Suite A-203 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERZER, Fred 4432 Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
MAWHINNEY, Daniel, D. 12 Elmwood Drive Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99938701.2 | 27.07.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999US14169 | Priority number, date | US19980137230 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: US 137230 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010472 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113748 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR FORMUNG EINES BIOLOGISCHEN STENTS | [2001/28] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A BIOLOGICAL STENT | [2001/28] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FORMER UN EXTENSEUR BIOLOGIQUE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 30.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.09.2010 | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/01] | 29.08.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 02.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9204934 (AMERICAN MED SYST [US]) [Y] 1-5,17-20,24 * page 11, line 7 - line 13 *; | [Y]WO9207622 (BSD MEDICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 13-16,26 * page 32, line 21 - line 32 ** page 21, line 25 - page 22, line 31 *; | [XY]US5129396 (ROSEN ARYE [US], et al) [X] 1,6-12,18-21,24,25 * column 5, line 7 - line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 13-16,26; | [XY]US5496311 (ABELE JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 21-23 * column 5, paragraph 37 - paragraph 45 * * column 6, line 42 - line 50 * * column 9, line 55 - line 61 * * column 11, line 6 - line 21 * * column 15, line 52 - line 59 * [Y] 1-5,17-20,24 | International search | [Y]US5007437 (STERZER FRED [US]); | [X]US5234004 (HASCOET GERARD [FR], et al); | [X]US5330518 (NEILSON BRUCE H [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9204934 | WO9207622 | US5129396 | US5496311 |