EP1100311 - NOVEL GENETIC MATERIALS FOR TRANSMISSION INTO MAIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eubanks, Mary Wilkes 8 Pilton Place Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/21] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99939009.9 | 05.08.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US17716 | Priority number, date | US19980095400P | 05.08.1998 Original published format: US 95400 P | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007434 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100311 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100311 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/00, A01H4/00, A01H1/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/05, C12N15/10 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6895 (EP,US);
A01H5/10 (EP,US);
A01H6/4684 (EP,US);
C12Q1/683 (EP,US);
Y02A40/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 12.03.2001 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE, GENETISCHE MATERIALIEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG IN DEN MAIS | [2001/21] | English: | NOVEL GENETIC MATERIALS FOR TRANSMISSION INTO MAIZE | [2001/21] | French: | NOUVELLES MATIERES GENETIQUES DESTINEES A ETRE TRANSMISES AU MAIS | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 26.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Request for further processing for: | 29.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/06] | BE | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | BE | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | BE | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5710367 (KINDIGER BRYAN K [US], et al) [Y] 16,17 * page 4, line 37 - line 46; example 2 *; | [XDY]US5750828 (EUBANKS MARY WILKES [US]) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 16,17; | [A] - TSANEV, V. ET AL, "Use of electrophoretic patterns of esterase and prolamins for proving genetic material from teosinte and Tripsacum in maize genome", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960101), vol. 124, no. 1, Database accession no. 5068, XP002228253 [A] 16,17 * abstract * | [ ] - DOKLADI NA BULGARSKATA AKADEMIYA NA NAUKITE ( 1994 ), 47(10), 89-92 | [A] - BOROVSKII, M. I. ET AL, "Mutations in the progeny of hybrids of maize with Tripsacum and teosinte", CABA, Database accession no. 78:87737, URL: STN, XP002228254 [A] * abstract * | [ ] - OTDALEN. GIBRIDIZATSIYA RAST. V MOLDAVII, ( 1976 ) PP. 4-6. PUBLISHER: STIINCA. KISHINEV SECONDARY SOURCE: REFERATIVNYI ZHURNAL (1977) 4.55.57, Nauchno-proizvodstvennoe ob"edinenie Gibrid, Moldavian SSR. | [AD] - EUBANKS M W, "Molecular analysis of crosses between Tripsacum dactyloides and Zea diploperennis (Poaceae).", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (1997), vol. 94, no. 6-7, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 707 - 712, XP002228281 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001220050469 | International search | [Y]US5330547 (EUBANKS MARY W [US]); | [Y]US5750828 (EUBANKS MARY WILKES [US]); | [Y] - BELOUSOVA N I, "HYBRIDIZATION OF MAIZE WITH TRIPSACUM IN RELATION TO THE PROBLEM OFEXPERIMENTAL INDUCTION OF APOMIXIS IN MAIZE", APOMIXIS AND BREEDING, XX, XX, XX, (19700101), pages 199 - 220, XP002925610 |