EP1067378 - APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY MEASURING MINUTE MEMBRANE POTENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Public University Corporation Akita Prefectural University 241-438, Kaidobata-Nishi Nakano Shimoshinjo Akita-shi Akita 010-0195 / JP | [2012/02] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states TOUDAI TLO, Ltd. 3-1, Hongo 7-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Center for Advanced Science and Technology Incubation, Ltd Shin-Marunouchi Building, 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Karube, Isao 1-3-16, Higashiarima Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216-0002 / JP | ||
For all designated states Saitoh, Takashi Laionzumanshon nishinippori Dai 2, 42-2-1002, Nishinippori 1-chome, Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karube, Isao 3-16, Higashiarima 1-chome, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216-0002 / JP | 02 /
Saitoh, Takashi SEBIRIA KOMABA 103, 4-7-21 Komaba Meguro-ku, Tokyo 153-0041 / JP | [2001/10] |
Former [2001/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99939219.4 | 12.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999JP01224 | Priority number, date | JP19980080182 | 12.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8018298 | [2001/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946588 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067378 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, C12M1/00, G01N37/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
C12M35/02 (EP,US);
Y10S977/873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2001/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN MESSUNG VON SEHR KLEINEN MEMBRANPOTENTIALEN | [2001/02] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATICALLY MEASURING MINUTE MEMBRANE POTENTIAL | [2001/02] | French: | APPAREIL SERVANT A MESURER AUTOMATIQUEMENT LE POTENTIEL D'UNE MEMBRANE MINUSCULE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2000 | Translation filed | 19.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 27.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH06308118 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH09289886 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JPH0862209 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH08122326 (FUJITSU LTD) |