EP1108315 - NEIGHBOUR CELL MEASUREMENTS FOR CELL RE-SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/30] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Ruohonen, Jari Solkikatu 8 D 82 33710 Tampere / FI | |||
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Ruohonen, Jari Solkikatu 8 D 82 33710 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUOHONEN, Jari Solkikatu 8 D 82 FIN-33710 Tampere / FI | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Folke Anders, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Rights P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Johansson, Folke Anders, et al Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 206 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 99939471.1 | 23.08.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999FI00690 | Priority number, date | FI19980001855 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: FI 981855 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013377 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108315 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108315 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q7/22 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H04W36/0094 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/44] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHBARZELLENMESSUNGEN FÜR ZELLENWIEDERWAHL | [2001/25] | English: | NEIGHBOUR CELL MEASUREMENTS FOR CELL RE-SELECTION | [2001/25] | French: | MESURES DE CELLULES VOISINES POUR UNE NOUVELLE SELECTION DE CELLULES | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 08.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5930710 (SAWYER FRANCOIS [CA], et al); | [AP]WO9838819 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [AP]US5883885 (RAITH ALEX KRISTER [US]); | [A]US5574996 (RAITH ALEX K [US]) |