EP1108276 - MODULAR GUIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSAN, Robert, Cité PTT Destrellan Nord F-97122 Baie Mahault / FR | [2002/19] |
Former [2001/25] | 01 /
CORSAN, Robert, Cité PTT Destrellan Nord F-97122 Mahault / FR | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/25] | Armengaud, Alain, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aine, 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99939496.8 | 24.08.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999FR02035 | Priority number, date | FR19980010682 | 25.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810682 | [2001/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011770 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108276 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108276 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/08, H02G9/10 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
B65H57/14 (EP,US);
H02G1/08 (EP,US);
H02G9/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/20] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2001/25] | English: | MODULAR GUIDING DEVICE | [2001/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE MODULAIRE | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE381597 (CONRAD MOELLER) [X] 1,4 * page 2, line 49 - line 112; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1865113 (KIESEL WILLIAM F) [A] 1 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 120; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE7730332U (SIEMENS) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3019667 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3320379 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 32; figures 1,2 * |