EP1064179 - FLUID CONTROL VALVE AND BRAKING SYSTEM INCORPORATING SUCH A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Suttons Business Park Reading Berks RG6 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Suttons Business Park Reading, Berks RG6 1LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Mark 52 Gaer Park Road Newport Gwent PN9 3NJ / GB | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn Withers & Rogers LLP Nicolas Wilson House Dormer Place Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Jones, John Bryn Withers & Rogers Nicolas Wilson House Dormer Place Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5AE / GB | ||
Former [2002/03] | Jones, John Bryn Withers & Rogers 75 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2AP / GB | ||
Former [2001/01] | Marsh, David John Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham, B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99939839.9 | 05.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999GB00653 | Priority number, date | GB19980005244 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805244 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947401 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064179 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064179 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/12, B60T11/224 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B60T11/224 (EP,US);
B60T13/12 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2567 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSREGELVENTIL UND EIN SOLCHES VENTIL ENTHALTENDES BREMSSYSTEM | [2001/01] | English: | FLUID CONTROL VALVE AND BRAKING SYSTEM INCORPORATING SUCH A VALVE | [2001/01] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE FLUIDE ET SYSTEME DE FREINAGE MUNI DE CETTE SOUPAPE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 04.03.2003 | [2003/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4073543 (RESCH REINHARD) [A] 1,9* column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4805966 (REINARTZ HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 30 - line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0465993 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 53; figure 2 * |