EP1101342 - TELEPHONE APPARATUS WITH VOLUME CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURST, Jeffrey 279 Tylehost Guildford GU2 6XT / GB | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99940047.6 | 26.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999EP05314 | Priority number, date | GB19980016547 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9816547 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007344 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101342 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101342 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04M9/08 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
H04M1/6016 (EP,US);
H04M1/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/03] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEFONAPPARAT MIT LAUTSTÄRKEREGELUNG | [2001/21] | English: | TELEPHONE APPARATUS WITH VOLUME CONTROL | [2001/21] | French: | APPAREIL TELEPHONIQUE AVEC REGLAGE DU VOLUME | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 21.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | BE | 18.01.2006 | CH | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | FR | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | LI | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | IE | 26.07.2006 | LU | 26.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
LU | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0299507 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,12,17,23,24 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 48 * * column 5, line 19 - line 43 * * column 7, line 16 - line 29 ** figure 5 *; | [A]US4829565 (GOLDBERG ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1,6-8,12,17,18,23,24 * column 2, line 40 - line 57 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 32 * * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 9 * * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]EP0661858 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-8,10-12,17-19,21,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 57 * * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 14 * * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 14 * * column 12, line 24 - line 39 * * column 13, line 41 - column 14, line 47 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 23,24; | [A]EP0717547 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,8,12,17,19,23,24 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 2 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0767570 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,8,11,12,19,22-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - line 47 * * page 5, line 5 - line 53 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5722086 (TEITLER NICOLE D [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8,9,12,17,19,20,23,24 * column 1, line 53 - line 67 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 16 * * figure 1 * |