EP1138547 - Vehicle Seat Locking Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/40] | VEHICLE SEAT LOCKING DEVICE | ||
[2004/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grupo Antolín Ingeniería, S.A. Carretera Madrid-Irún, Km. 244,8 09007 Burgos / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Grupo Antolin Ingenieria, S.A. Carretera Madrid-Irun, Km. 244,8 E-09007 Burgos / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINGUEZ RUBIO, Francisco Trujillo, 6 E-09007 Burgos / ES | 02 /
OLMEDO DIEZ, Rafael Miranda, 5 E-09002 Burgos / ES | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel, et al UDAPI & Asociados Explanada 8 28040 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel, et al UDAPI & Asociados Patentes y Marcas Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2001/40] | Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio Principe de Vergara, 31 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 99940213.4 | 23.08.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999ES00271 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0114166 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138547 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138547 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/20, B60N2/433, E05C3/00 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
E05B77/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/30 (KR);
B60N2/366 (EP,US);
B60N2/433 (EP,US);
E05C3/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schliessvorrichtung für einen Fahrzeugsitz | [2004/43] | English: | Vehicle Seat Locking Device | [2004/43] | French: | Dispositif de verrouilage de siège de véhicule | [2004/43] |
Former [2001/40] | SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | ||
Former [2001/40] | VEHICLE SEAT LOCKING DEVICE | ||
Former [2001/40] | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE SI GE DE V HICULE | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2001 | Translation filed | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.03.2005 | [2008/18] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2774122 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4444122 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3410600 (THORPE REGINALD P) [A] * column 3, line 34 - line 52; figures 2,6 * |