EP1102791 - MODIFIED GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cancer Research Technology Limited 61 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3PX / GB | [2003/06] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CANCER RESEARCH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Sardinia House, Sardinia Street London WC2A 3NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIAENS, Philippe 134a Royal College Street Camden, London NW1 0TA / GB | 02 /
PEPPERKOK, Rainer Hohl Strasse 19 D-68809 Neulussheim / DE | 03 /
GELEY, Stefan 11 Frampton Road Potters Bar, Herts EN6 1JF / GB | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99940293.6 | 06.08.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999GB02596 | Priority number, date | GB19980017225 | 08.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9817225 | GB19980017227 | 08.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9817227 | GB19980017229 | 08.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9817229 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008054 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102791 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, G01N33/533 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/43595 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES GRÜNES FLUORESZENZPROTEIN | [2001/22] | English: | MODIFIED GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN | [2001/22] | French: | PROTEINE A FLUORESCENCE VERTE MODIFIEE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 21.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9627675 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL ;HASELOFF JAMES PHILLIP (AU); HODGE SARAH (GB)) [A] *Seq. ID. 10*; page 31, line 11; claims 11-15 *; | [A]WO9806737 (HEIM ROGER ;CUBITT ANDREW B (GB); ORMO MATS F (SE); REMINGTON JAME) [A] * claim - *; | [A]WO9711094 (NOVONORDISK AS ;THASTRUP OLE (DK); TULLIN SOEREN (DK); POULSEN LAR) [A] * page 3, line 13 *; | [A]US5625048 (TSIEN ROGER Y ET AL) [A] * claims 8,12 *; | [A]WO9830715 (ISACOFF EHUD Y ;SIEGAL MICAH S (US); UNIV CALIFORNIA (US); CALIFOR) |