EP1109588 - A CONTINUOUS POSITIVE AIRWAY PRESSURE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caradyne (R & D) Limited Parkmore Business Centre Parkmore West Galway / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Caradyne (R & D) Limited Parkmore Business Centre Parkmore West, Galway / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'DEA, John 66 Westbrook, Barna Road Galway / IE | 02 /
DENYER, John "Sunnyside", West Bay, West Broyle Chichester, West Sussex PO19 3PW / GB | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus, et al F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Gorman, Francis Fergus, et al F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99940442.9 | 03.09.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999IE00090 | Priority number, date | IE19980000739 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: IE 980739 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013731 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109588 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109588 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/12 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A61M16/12 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M16/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/14] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KONTROLLSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES KONTINUIERLICHEN POSITIVEN ATEMWEGDRUCKS | [2001/26] | English: | A CONTINUOUS POSITIVE AIRWAY PRESSURE CONTROLLER | [2001/26] | French: | PRESSOSTAT DE REGULATION DE LA PRESSION POSITIVE CONTINUE DES VOIES AERIENNES | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.10.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 28.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 21.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | CY | 03.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2174609 (PNEUPAC LTD) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 11; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE3537507 (SALVIA REGEL UND MEDIZINTECHNI [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 19; figure - *; | [A]US4905688 (VICENZI RENO L [US], et al); | [X]EP0691137 (PNEUPAC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 12 - line 30; figures 2A,5 * * column 6, line 21 - line 49 *; | [A]WO9720592 (CARDIOPULMONARY CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 6 - page 13, line 20; figures 1,4,5 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 26 * |