EP1111048 - NEUTRAL AMINO ACID TRANSPORTER AND GENE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDOU, Hitoshi 1-23-7, Yoshinodai Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 229-0022 / JP | 02 /
KANAI, Yoshikatsu 214-102, Midori-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0932 / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99940648.1 | 03.09.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999JP04789 | Priority number, date | JP19980249993 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: JP 24999398 | JP19990248546 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: JP 24854699 | [2001/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0014228 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111048 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111048 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NEUTRALER AMINOSÄURENTRANSPORTER UND KORRESPONDIERENDES GEN | [2001/26] | English: | NEUTRAL AMINO ACID TRANSPORTER AND GENE THEREOF | [2001/26] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR D'ACIDES AMINES NEUTRES ET GENE CORRESPONDANT | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | Translation filed | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TORRENTS D. ET AL., "Identification and characterization of a membrane protein (y+L amino acid transporter-1) that associates with 4F2 to encode the amino acid transport activity y+L. A candidate gene for lysinuric protein intolerance.", J. BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, no. 49, pages 32437 - 32445, XP002178117 [X] 1-4,16-19,29-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.49.32437 | [PX] - ESTEVEZ R, CAMPS M, ROJAS AM, TESTAR X, DEVES R, HEDIGER MA, ZORZANO A, PALACIN M., "The amino acid transport system y+L/4F2hc is a heteromultimeric complex.", FASEB J, (199810), vol. 12, no. 13, pages 1319 - 1329, XP002178118 [PX] 1-4,16-19,29-32 * the whole document * | [A] - BROER A, HAMPRECHT B, BROER S., "Discrimination of two amino acid transport activities in 4F2 heavy chain- expressing Xenopus laevis oocytes.", BIOCHEM J, (19980801), vol. 333, no. 3, pages 549 - 554, XP002178119 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * | [A] - WELLS RG ET AL., "The 4F2 antigen heavy chain induces uptake of neutral and dibasic amino acids in Xenopus oocytes", J. BIOL CHEM, (19920805), vol. 267, no. 22, pages 15285 - 15288, XP002178120 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * | [A] - GOTTESDIENER ET AL., "Isolation and structural characterization of the human 4F2 heavy-chain gene, an inducible gene involved in T-lymphocyte activation", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (198809), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 3809 - 3819, XP001025922 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * | [A] - SPINDLER ET AL., "Characterization of early aldosterone-induced RNAs identified in A6 kidney epithelia", PFLUGERS ARCH, (1997), vol. 434, pages 323 - 333, XP001025924 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004240050403 | [T] - BRÖER ET AL., "Association of 4F2hc with light chains LAT1, LAT2 or y+LAT2 requires different domains", BIOCHEM. J., (20010501), vol. 355, no. 3, pages 725 - 731, XP001025945 [T] 1-39 * the whole document * | International search | [XP] - PRASAD D.P. ET AL., "Human LAT1, a Subunit of System L Amino Acid Transporter: Molecular Cloning and Transport Function", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (199902), vol. 255, no. 2, pages 283 - 288, XP002925587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0206 | [XP] - TSURUDOME M. ET AL., "Cutting Edge: Primary Structure of the Light Chain of Fusion Regulatory Protein-1/CD98/4F2 Predicts a Protein with Multiple Transmembrane Domains that is Almost Identical to the Amino Acid Transporter E16", J. IMMUNOL., (199903), vol. 162, no. 5, pages 2462 - 2466, XP002925588 | [XP] - MASTROBERARDINO L. ET AL., "Amino-acid transport by heterodimers of 4F2hc/CD98 and members of a permease family", NATURE, (19980917), vol. 395, no. 6699, pages 288 - 291, XP002925589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/26246 | [XP] - KANAI Y. ET AL., "Expression Cloning and Characterization of a Transporter for Large Neutral Amino Acids Activated by the Heavy Chain of 4F2 Antigen (CD98)", J. BIOL. CHEM.., (19980911), vol. 273, no. 37, pages 23629 - 23632, XP002925590 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.37.23629 | [XP] - NAKAMURA E. ET AL., "4F2(CD98) Heavy Chain is Associated Covalently with an Amino Acid Transporter and Controls Intracellular Trafficking and Membrane Topology of 4F2 Heterodimer", J. BIOL. CHEM., (199902), vol. 274, no. 5, pages 3009 - 3016, XP002925591 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.5.3009 | [X] - HAYNES F.B. ET AL., "Characterization of a Monoclonal Antibody(4F2) that Binds to Human Monocytes and to a Subset of Activated Lymphocytes", J. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 128, no. 4, pages 1409 - 1414, XP002925592 | [X] - HEMLER M. E. ET AL., "Characterization of the Antigen Recognized by the Monoclonal Antibody(4F2): Different Molecular Forms on Human T and B Lymphoblastoid Cell Lines", J. IMMUNOL., (1982), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 623 - 628, XP002925593 | [A] - TEIXEIRA S. ET AL., "Primary Structure of the Human 4F2 Antigen Heavy Chain Predicts a Transmembrane Protein with a Cytoplasmic NH2 Terminus", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, no. 20, pages 9574 - 9580, XP002925594 | [A] - LUMADUE J.A. ET AL., "Cloning, sequence analysis and expression of the large subunit of the human lymphocyte activation antigen 4F2", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, no. 24, pages 9204 - 9208, XP002925595 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.24.9204 | [A] - QUACKENBUSH E. ET AL., "Molecular Cloning of Complementary DNAs Encoding the Heavy Chain of the Human 4F2 Cell-Surface Antigen: A Type II Membrane Glycoprotein Involved in Normal and Neoplastic Cell Growth", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, no. 18, pages 6526 - 6530, XP002925596 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.18.6526 | [A] - BROER S. ET AL., "The 4F2hc surface antigen is necessary for expression of system L-like neutral amino acid-transport activity in C6-BU-1 rat glioma cells: evidence from expression studies in Xenopus laevis oocytes", BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 312, no. 3, pages 863 - 870, XP002925597 | [A] - YAO S.Y.M. ET AL., "Cloning and Functional Expression of a cDNA from Rat Jejunal Epithelium Encoding a Protein(4F2hc) with System y+L Amino Acid Transport Activity", BIOCHEM. J., (199803), vol. 330, no. 2, pages 745 - 752, XP002925598 | [A] - GAUGITSCH H.W. ET AL., "A Novel Transiently Expressed, Integral Membrane Protein Linked to Cell Activation", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, no. 16, pages 11267 - 11273, XP002925599 |