EP1104290 - MICROEMULSIONS AS SOLID DOSAGE FORMS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIMA LABS INC. 10000 Valley View Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344-9361 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2001/23] | For all designated states CIMA LABS INC. 10.000 Valley View Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344-9361 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATHER, S., Indiran 13240 Sunset Trail Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | 02 /
GUPTE, Sangeeta, V. 18737 95th Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 03 /
KHANKARI, Rajendra, K. 18065 87th Place North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 04 /
HONTZ, John 12800 54th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 05 /
KUMBALE, Ramya Apartment B,1018 27th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [2004/25] |
Former [2001/23] | 01 /
PATHER, S., Indiran 13240 Sunset Trail Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | ||
02 /
GUPTE, Sangeeta, V. 18737 95th Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | |||
03 /
KHANKARI, Rajendra, K. 18065 87th Place North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | |||
04 /
HONTZ, John 12800 54th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | |||
05 /
ROBINSON, Joseph, R. 41 Chequamegon Bay Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
06 /
EICHMAN, Jonathan, D. 1531 Natalie Lane Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
07 /
KUMBALE, Ramya Apartment B,1018 27th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Karsten, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Schmidt, Karsten, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/23] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99941159.8 | 13.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999US18552 | Priority number, date | US19980096347P | 13.08.1998 Original published format: US 96347 P | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0009093 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104290 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104290 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K9/46, A61K9/14 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
A61K9/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/23] | Title | German: | MICROEMULSIONEN ALS FESTE DOSISFORMEN ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG | [2001/23] | English: | MICROEMULSIONS AS SOLID DOSAGE FORMS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION | [2001/23] | French: | MICROEMULSIONS COMME FORMES PHARMACEUTIQUES SOLIDES DESTINEES A UNE ADMINISTRATION ORALE | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09011793.8 / EP2127642 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | IE | 13.08.2010 | LU | 13.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.08.2010 | ||
LU | 13.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3962384 (CANNALONGA MARCO ALFRED, et al) [X] 1-25 * column 1, line 44 - line 53 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]GB1572718 (KOCKUMS CHEM) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 44 - line 50 * * page 3, line 1 - line 8 * * page 6, line 18 - line 23 ** example 5 *; | [X]FR2594693 (FARAH NABIL [FR]) [X] 1-25 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 10 - line 17 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1,8,10 *; | [X]US5656289 (CHO YOUNG W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-21,24,25 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 4 * * column 12, line 17 - line 34 * * column 12, line 52 - line 57 * * column 14, line 10 - line 20 * * examples 3-8,15,16 * | International search | [Y]US5206219 (DESAI ASHOK J [US]); | [ ] - SPIREAS ET AL, "Powdered solution technoloy:principles and mechanisms", PHARM. RESEARCH, (19921110), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 1351 - 1358, XP002923448 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015877905988 | [Y] - SHETH ET AL., "Use of powdered solutions to improve the dissolution rate of polythiazide tablets", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL, (1990), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 769 - 777, XP002923449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/03639049009114908 |