EP1113765 - INSERTABLE STENT AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/28] | INSERTABLE STENT AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | ||
[2006/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Providence Health System - Oregon 520 Pike Street Seattle, WA 98111-9038 / US | [2006/51] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Providence Health System - Oregon 520 Pike Street Seattle, WA 98111-9038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Hua 10480 S.W. Eastridge 89 Portland, OR 97225 / US | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | Silverman, Warren Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99941241.4 | 18.08.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999US19003 | Priority number, date | US19980097357P | 21.08.1998 Original published format: US 97357 P | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010488 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113765 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113765 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/16, A61L31/04 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
A61L31/043 (EP,US);
A61L31/044 (EP,US);
A61L31/046 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00508 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61L2300/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/043, A61L31/18, A61L31/16, A61L31/148, A61L31/14, A61L31/046, A61L31/044, A61L31/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/51] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARER STENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/24] | English: | INSERTABLE STENT AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME | [2006/24] | French: | STENT IMPLANTABLE ET PRODUCTION DE CE STENT | [2006/24] |
Former [2001/28] | IMPLANTIERBARER STENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELUNG UND SEINER ANWENDUNG | ||
Former [2001/28] | INSERTABLE STENT AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | ||
Former [2001/28] | STENT IMPLANTABLE ET PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DE CE STENT | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2006 | BE | 20.12.2006 | CH | 20.12.2006 | CY | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IT | 20.12.2006 | LI | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | ES | 31.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | GB | 18.08.2007 | LU | 18.08.2007 | IE | 20.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
BE | 20.12.2006 | ||
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5100429 (SINOFSKY EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 5, line 4 - line 32 * * column 10, line 45 - line 64 *; | [X]WO9614807 (SISTERS OF PROVIDENCE IN OREGO [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 10 * * page 16, line 21 - line 29 * * page 20, line 19 - line 26 *; | [X]WO9834563 (SISTERS OF PROVIDENCE IN OREGO [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 30, lines 9-17 * * page 34, line 15 - line 19 * * page 33, line 7 - line 16 *; | [X]WO9834565 (VIDACARE INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 8, line 6 - line 7 ** page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 10 * | International search | [A]US5593403 (BUSCEMI PAUL J [US]); | [A]US5741327 (FRANTZEN JOHN J [US]); | [A]US5769883 (BUSCEMI PAUL J [US], et al); | [AP]US5849035 (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US], et al); | [AP]US5851231 (WOLFF RODNEY G [US], et al) |