EP1128929 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WELDED BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URECH, Werner Rheingasse 28 CH-5466 Kaiserstuhl / CH | [2001/36] | Application number, filing date | 99941359.4 | 14.09.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999CH00435 | Priority number, date | CH19980002279 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: CH 227998 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029168 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128929 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128929 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/047, B23K26/08 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
B23K37/047 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0838 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG GESCHWEISSTER PLATINEN | [2001/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WELDED BLANKS | [2001/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE PLATINES SOUDEES | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.07.2003 | IE | 02.07.2003 | AT | 14.09.2003 | CY | 14.09.2003 | LU | 14.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
IE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CY | 14.09.2003 | ||
LU | 14.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
IE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CY | 14.09.2003 | ||
LU | 14.09.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
IE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CY | 14.09.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
IE | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2308458 (SOCERMA SARL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,12,13,15,17,18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3912036 (BAYERISCHER MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [XA]US4991707 (ALEXANDER ROBERT O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,12,13,15,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 10,11; | [A]US5395205 (DUGAS MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,10-13,15-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0743129 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [AD] 1,2,9-12,14 | Examination | DE2754426 | by applicant | EP0532835 |