EP1044363 - OPTOELECTRONIC GAS SENSOR BASED ON OPTODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Joachim Südstrasse 8 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
PFEFFERSEDER, Anton Oberlandstrasse 20 D-82054 Sauerlach-Arget / DE | 03 /
HENSEL, Andreas Roemerstrasse 80 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | 04 /
OPPELT, Ulrich Obere Bahnhofstrasse 40 D-85604 Zorneding / DE | [2000/42] | Application number, filing date | 99941402.2 | 29.06.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999DE01884 | Priority number, date | DE1998135769 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19835769 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008447 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044363 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044363 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G02B6/42 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
G01N21/7703 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/7753 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/42] | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHER GASSENSOR AUF DER BASIS VON OPTODEN | [2000/42] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC GAS SENSOR BASED ON OPTODES | [2000/42] | French: | DETECTEUR DE GAZ OPTOELECTRONIQUE A BASE D'OPTODES | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4755667 (MARSONER HERMANN [AT], et al) [A] 1-16* figure 7 *; | [A]US4872759 (STICH-BAUMEISTER EVA-M [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5177352 (CARSON RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US5442169 (KUNZ RINO E [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * figures 3B,4B *; | [Y]US5737457 (SAINI DEVINDER P [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1A,2A *; | [A]EP0834735 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,3 *; | [PX]US5822473 (MAGEL GREGORY ANTON [US], et al) [PX] 1-16 * figures 4,5 * |