EP1040580 - CMOS OUTPUT AMPLIFIER INDEPENDENT OF TEMPERATURE, SUPPLY VOLTAGE AND MANUFACTURING QUALITY OF TRANSISTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | For:FR
FRANCE TELECOM 38-40 Rue du Général Leclerc 92131 Issy-Les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | |||
For:FR
FRANCE TELECOM 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92131 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | |||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:FR
STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | |||
For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92131 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | |||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:FR
STMicroelectronics S.A. 850 rue Jean Monnet 38926 Crolles cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92131 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABRAM, Steven, M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MARBOUX, Guy Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99941464.2 | 19.07.1999 | [2000/40] | WO1999EP05339 | Priority number, date | FR19980009436 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809436 | [2000/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005818 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040580 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003, H03L7/099, H03K3/03 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H03K3/0315 (EP,US);
H03K19/00384 (EP,US);
H03L1/00 (EP,US);
H03L7/0997 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | CMOS AUSGANGSVERSTÄRKER UNABHÄNGIG VON TEMPERATUR,SPEISESPANNUNG UND DER HERSTELLUNGSQUALITÄT SEINER TRANSISTOREN | [2000/40] | English: | CMOS OUTPUT AMPLIFIER INDEPENDENT OF TEMPERATURE, SUPPLY VOLTAGE AND MANUFACTURING QUALITY OF TRANSISTORS | [2000/40] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE SORTIE CMOS INDEPENDANT DE LA TEMPERATURE, DE LA TENSION D'ALIMENTATION ET DE LA QUALITE DE FABRICATION DE SES TRANSISTORS | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 11.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4894561 (NOGAMI KAZUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 4, line 1 - column 8, line 13; figures 4-9 * [Y] 4; | [XA]US5428303 (PASQUALINI RONALD [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 4 * * column 7, line 63 - line 68; figure 7 * [A] 7; | [YA]US5418499 (NAKAO KENJI [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 2 * * column 7, line 21 - column 9, line 57; figures 5,6,11 * * column 9, line 60 - column 11, line 29; figures 12-14 * [A] 7,10; | [A]EP0253914 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 3,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0580209 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 17, line 8 - column 19, line 36; figure 9 * * column 19, line 43 - column 23, line 41; figure 11 * |