EP1102958 - STAB RESISTANT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Twaron GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | For all designated states FMS Enterprises Ltd. P.O. Box 18077 Tel-Aviv 61180 / IL | [2009/51] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Teijin Twaron GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
For all designated states FMS Enterprises Ltd. P.O. Box 18077 Tel-Aviv 61180 / IL | |||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Aramid Products GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
For all designated states FMS Enterprises Ltd. P.O. Box 18077 Tel-Aviv 61180 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUCHS, Yuval Raines Street 35 42475 Netanya / IL | 02 /
BÖTTGER, Christian Geschwister Scholl-Strasse 25 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | 03 /
FELS, Achim Adalbert-Stifter-Weg 8 D-42109 Wuppertal / DE | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Heimann, Anette CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Heimann, Anette, Dr. CPW GmbH Patentabteilung Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V., Intellectual Property Department (Dept. AIP), P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 99941502.9 | 30.07.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999EP05574 | Priority number, date | EP19980114608 | 04.08.1998 Original published format: EP 98114608 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008411 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102958 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102958 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1102958 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F41H1/02 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
F41H1/02 (EP,KR,US);
F41H5/0478 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2615 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3472 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3602 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 22.01.2001 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STICHSCHUTZMATERIAL | [2001/22] | English: | STAB RESISTANT MATERIAL | [2001/22] | French: | MATIERE RESISTANTE AUX COUPS DE COUTEAU | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
16.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
16.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2003
Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US Opponent's representative Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | 22.08.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.02.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.11.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0668/07 | 25.06.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 16.01.2003 | CY | 30.07.2003 | LU | 30.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
CY | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
CY | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4738893 (GRILLO CHRISTIAN C G [FR]); | [A]US5001003 (MAHR PETER F [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 15 *; | [DA]WO9721334 (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - line 15; claims 1,2,7,15 * | Opposition | US4916000 | US5677029 |