EP1105977 - ADAPTIVE RECEIVER FOR MULTIPATH PROPAGATION IN A CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTMAN, Tapani Tinatie 10 FIN-90250 Oulu / FI | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99941569.8 | 10.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999EP05827 | Priority number, date | GB19980018378 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9818378 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011798 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105977 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105977 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/005, H04B7/08, H04L1/12 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H04B1/7115 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7117 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER EMPFÄNGER FÜR VIELFACHWEGAUSBREITUNG IN EINEN KODEMULTIPLEX-VIELFACHZUGRIFF-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2001/24] | English: | ADAPTIVE RECEIVER FOR MULTIPATH PROPAGATION IN A CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2001/24] | French: | RECEPTEUR ADAPTATIF A PROPAGATION SUR PLUSIEURS VOIES POUR SYSTEME AMCR DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2004 | BE | 13.10.2004 | CH | 13.10.2004 | FI | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | LI | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | SE | 13.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0551081 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * claims 6,9-11 * * figure 40 * [A] 8,9,13,15; | [A]GB2280575 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [A] 5,6 * page 16, line 7 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0715440 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 10* page 6, line 23 - line 56 *; | [XY]US5757846 (VASUDEVAN SUBRAMANIAN [US]) [X] 1-4,14,16-19 * column 2, line 19 - line 51 * * column 3, line 43 - line 61; figure 3 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 36; figure 4 * [Y] 7,10; | [Y] - FUXJAEGER A W ET AL, "ADAPTIVE PARAMETER ESTIMATION USING PARALLEL KALMAN FILTERING FOR SREAD SPECTRUM CODE AND DOPPLER TRACKING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 42, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, page 2227-2230, XP000456234 [Y] 10 * page 2227, column L, line 1 - line 21 * * page 2228, column R, line 38 - page 2229, column L, line 42 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.293672 |