EP1105304 - PARKING LOCK FOR THE AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION OF MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUPT, Josef Alpenblickstrasse 48 D-88069 Tettnang / DE | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 99941624.1 | 14.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999EP05978 | Priority number, date | DE1998137832 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837832 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010846 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105304 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105304 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/00, F16H63/48 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
F16H63/3491 (EP,US);
B60K20/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2003/24] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PARKSPERRE FÜR AUTOMATISCHE GETRIEBE VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2001/24] | English: | PARKING LOCK FOR THE AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION OF MOTOR VEHICLES | [2001/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE STATIONNEMENT POUR BOITES DE VITESSES AUTOMATIQUES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4576261 (BARR WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3537091 (FORD WERKE AG) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4026573 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4127991 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE4317257 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-3 * |