EP1109983 - SCREW-ON HINGE WITH BLOCKED POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramsauer, Dieter Am Neuhauskothen 20 D-42555 Velbert / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Stratmann, Ernst, et al Strücker Weg 14 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing., et al Schadowplatz 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99941634.0 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999EP06023 | Priority number, date | DE1998215747U | 02.09.1998 Original published format: DE 29815747 U | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014371 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109983 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109983 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/10 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
E05D11/1078 (EP,US);
E05D5/10 (EP,US);
E05D7/1005 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/26 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/43] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ANSCHRAUBSCHARNIER MIT RASTSTELLUNG | [2001/26] | English: | SCREW-ON HINGE WITH BLOCKED POSITION | [2001/26] | French: | CHARNIERE A VISSER COMPORTANT UNE POSITION D'ARRET | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2182546 (RAYMOND THOMAS E) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DY]DE2941860 (ORRACO GERALD CORTHESY FA) [DY] 1-7,13 * page 5 - page 7; figure - *; | [Y]DE29709777U (BREUST VOLKER DIPL DESIGNER [DE]) [Y] 1-7,13 * page 5, paragraph 4; figure - * | by applicant | DE2235555 | DE2342945 | DE2418147 | DE2941860 | DE2941880 | DE3126933 | DE3624649 | DE3905351 | EP0266490 | US5412842 | DE19619473 |