EP1097393 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A 3D IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coda Octopus Group Inc. 111 Town Square Place, Suite 1201 Jersey City NJ 07310 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Coda Octopus Group Inc. 164 West 25th Street, 6th Floor New York NY 10001 / US | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Codaoctopus Omnitech AS Postboks 23 Maaseskjaeret Bergen 5035 / NO | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Codaoctopus Omnitech AS Postboks 23 Maaseskjaeret Bergen 5035 / NO | ||
For all designated states Hansen, Rolf Kahrs Kolashoyen 56 5135 Flatveit / NO | |||
For all designated states Andersen, Poul Arndt Flaktveitvegen 386 5134 Flatveit / NO | |||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Omnitech AS Nedre Astveit 12 5106 Ovre Ervik / NO | ||
For all designated states Hansen, Rolf Kahrs Kolashoyen 56 5135 Flatveit / NO | |||
For all designated states Andersen, Poul Arndt Flaktveitvegen 386 5134 Flatveit / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Rolf, Kahrs Kolåsho̸yen 56 N-5135 Flaktveit / NO | 02 /
ANDERSEN, Poul, Arndt Flaktveitvegen 386 N-5134 Flaktveit / NO | [2010/36] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
HANSEN, Rolf, Kahrs Kolashoyen 56 N-5135 Flaktveit / NO | ||
02 /
ANDERSEN, Poul, Arndt Flaktveitvegen 386 N-5134 Flaktveit / NO | |||
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
HANSEN, Rolf, Kahrs Kol sh yen 56 N-5135 Flaktveit / NO | ||
02 /
ANDERSEN, Poul, Arndt Flaktveitvegen 386 N-5134 Flaktveit / NO | Representative(s) | Thrane, Dag, et al Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | [2010/03] |
Former [2008/14] | Thrane, Dag, et al Protector Intellectual Property Consultants AS Box 5074 Majorstuen 0301 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2007/50] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99941901.3 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999NO00176 | Priority number, date | NO19980002891 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: NO 982891 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966343 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097393 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097393 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01S15/89 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
G01S15/89 (EP,US);
G01S15/8904 (EP,US);
G01S7/6245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDES | [2001/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A 3D IMAGE | [2001/19] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A PRODUIRE UNE IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2002 | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2005 | 30.06.2010 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | LU | 01.06.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/20] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0026385 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US5200931 (KOSALOS JAMES G [US], et al) |