EP1095536 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A ROUTE VIA A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG Hofmannstrasse 51 81379 München / DE | [2011/19] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜNLICH, Klaus Birkenstrasse 4 D-85467 Neuching / DE | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99942766.9 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999DE01953 | Priority number, date | DE1998129821 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829821 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002412 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095536 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095536 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/562 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/08] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINRICHTEN EINES LEITWEGES ÜBER EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2001/18] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A ROUTE VIA A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2001/18] | French: | PROCEDE D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE VOIE SUR UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2004 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0406842 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * Absatz "Call Set-Up Phase" *; | [Y] - BAKKER E M ET AL, "PREFIX ROUTING SCHEMES IN DYNAMIC NETWORKS", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0169-7552, page 403-421, XP000415048 [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(93)90079-J | [A] - GARCIA-LUNA-ACEVES J J, "LIBRA: A DISTRIBUTED ROUTING ALGORITHM FOR LARGE INTERNETS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0608-2, page 1465-1471, XP000390448 [A] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1992.276633 | [A] - MCDONALD A B ET AL, "ARP VERSUS ES-IS: PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF NEIGHBOUR-GREETING PROTOCOLS", COMPUTER JOURNAL,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, vol. 39, no. 10, ISSN 0010-4620, page 854-867, XP000729298 [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/39.10.854 |