EP1048025 - METHOD FOR OBJECTIVE VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/44] | METHOD FOR INSTRUMENTAL VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION | ||
[2003/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Jens Raabestrasse 8 D-10405 Berlin / DE | [2000/44] | Application number, filing date | 99942871.7 | 14.08.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999EP05972 | Priority number, date | DE1998140548 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19840548 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013173 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048025 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048025 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G10L25/69 (EP,US);
G10L25/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INSTRUMENTELLEN SPRACHQUALITÄTSBESTIMMUNG | [2000/44] | English: | METHOD FOR OBJECTIVE VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION | [2003/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION INSTRUMENTALE DE LA QUALITE VOCALE | [2000/44] |
Former [2000/44] | METHOD FOR INSTRUMENTAL VOICE QUALITY EVALUATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | IE | 05.11.2003 | IT | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | ES | 16.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5621854 (HOLLIER MICHAEL P [GB]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 14 ** column 8, line 38 - line 55 * |