EP1130080 - GAS TURBINE FUEL OIL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF AND POWER GENERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JGC Corporation 2-1, Ohte-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states JGC Corporation 2-1, Ohte-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Tsuyoshi, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 02 /
MASHIKO, Yoshinori, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 03 /
TOKUDA, Shinichi, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Tomoyoshi, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 05 /
IMURA, Kozo, JGC Corporation Kinuura Laboratory 2-110, Sunosakicho Handa-shi, Aichi 475-0021 / JP | 06 /
INOMATA, Makoto, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | 07 /
TANUMA, Toshio, JGC Corporation 3-1, Minatomirai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-6001 / JP | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99943259.4 | 10.09.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999JP04927 | Priority number, date | JP19980326169 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: JP 32616998 | JP19990010847 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1084799 | JP19990089433 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8943399 | [2001/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026325 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130080 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10G67/02, F02C7/22 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
C10G65/16 (EP,US);
C10G65/00 (KR);
C10G65/04 (EP,US);
C10G67/00 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1033 (EP,US);
C10G2300/107 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/205 (EP,US);
C10G2300/302 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TREIBSTOFFÖL FÜR GASTURBINEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRIZITÄT | [2001/36] | English: | GAS TURBINE FUEL OIL AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF AND POWER GENERATION METHOD | [2001/36] | French: | HUILE COMBUSTIBLE POUR TURBINE A GAZ, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2001 | Translation filed | 19.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3287254 (PATERSON NORMAN J) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US3306845 (POLL HARRY F) [X] 6-17 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1205481 (CHEVRON RES [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US3801495 (GOULD G) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US3830731 (REED E, et al) [X] 6-17* the whole document *; | [X]US4006076 (CHRISTENSEN ROBERT I, et al) [X] 6-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0386793 (TONEN CORP); | [A]JPH06207179 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH06209600 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH07197040 (TONEN CORP); | [A]JPH0848981 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP); | [A]JPH08183964 (TONEN CORP); | [A]JPH08183961 (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al); | [A]JPH09194852 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH102234 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) |