EP1115834 - DRYER-ADDED FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A TERNARY FRAGRANCE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Rhonda, Jean 1350 Oak Knoll Drive Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | 02 /
MORGAN, George, Kavin, III 1972 DeCamp Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al The Procter & Gamble Company Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Gault, Nathalie, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 99943851.8 | 24.08.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US19207 | Priority number, date | US19980097814P | 25.08.1998 Original published format: US 97814 P | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011134 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115834 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04, C11D3/50, C11D1/62, C11D3/30 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D17/047 (EP);
C11D3/222 (EP);
C11D3/507 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TERNÄRE PARFÜMFREISETZUNGSSYSTEME ENTHALTENDE WÄSCHEWEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DEN WÄSCHETROCKNER | [2001/29] | English: | DRYER-ADDED FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A TERNARY FRAGRANCE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2001/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ASSOUPLISSANT POUR TISSUS AJOUTES DANS UN SECHE-LINGE CONTENANT UN SYSTEME TERNAIRE D'APPORT DE PARFUM | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 03.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9827192 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-12 * page 27 - page 28; example -; claim - * * page 2 - page 3 *; | [A]WO9817757 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-12 * page 43 - page 46 * * page 2 *; | [A]WO9411482 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-11 * example 19; claim - *; | [A]US5474691 (SEVERNS JOHN C) [A] 1-11 * column 21 - column 22; claim - *; | [A]WO9807405 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-12 * page 2; claim - * |