EP1105448 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING N-ACYLAMINO ACIDS OR THEIR SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAR, Martin Methfesselstrasse 88 D-20255 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
SCHMUCKER, Robert Holsteiner Chaussee 154 A D-22523 Hamburg / DE | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 99944454.0 | 20.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999EP06113 | Priority number, date | DE1998138034 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838034 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011124 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105448 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/37, A61K8/29, C11D1/10 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | C11D1/37, A61K7/50, // (C11D1/10, 1:29) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND N-ACYLAMINOSÄUREN ODER DEREN SALZE | [2001/24] | English: | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS CONTAINING N-ACYLAMINO ACIDS OR THEIR SALTS | [2001/24] | French: | PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES OU DERMATOLOGIQUES CONTENANT DES ACIDES N-ACYLAMINES OU LEURS SELS | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0256656 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 17 - line 24; example - *; | [XA]DE3637683 (LION CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * examples 1-7 * [A] 3-6; | [XA]WO9502388 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2 * examples I-III * [A] 3-6; | [XA]EP0229690 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 10 - line 11; examples I-VI * [A] 3-6; | [DA]DE4304066 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [A]US5328630 (NOZAKI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0648833 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * table 10 *; | [A]JPS63112695 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 25, Database accession no. 1988-173133, XP002123641 & JPS63112695 A 19880517 (LION CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |