EP1131149 - Filter arrangement with at least two filter chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/37] | REVERSING VALVE FOR A FILTER ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST TWO FILTER CHAMBERS | ||
[2003/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Hydac Filtertechnik GmbH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIDINGER, Martin Bliesransbacher Strasse 42a D-66130 Saarbrücken / DE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944492.0 | 24.08.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999EP06194 | Priority number, date | DE1998151193 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851193 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027502 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131149 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131149 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/42, B01D35/12, F16K31/60, F16K35/02 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
G05G5/00 (EP,US);
B01D35/12 (EP,US);
B01D35/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Title | German: | Filteranordnung mit mindestens zwei Filterkammern | [2003/07] | English: | Filter arrangement with at least two filter chambers | [2003/07] | French: | Dispositif filtrant doté d'au moins deux chambres filtrantes | [2003/07] |
Former [2001/37] | UMSCHALTVENTIL FÜR FILTERANORDNUNG MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI FILTERKAMMERN | ||
Former [2001/37] | REVERSING VALVE FOR A FILTER ARRANGEMENT WITH AT LEAST TWO FILTER CHAMBERS | ||
Former [2001/37] | DISTRIBUTEUR D'INVERSION DESTINE A UN DISPOSITIF FILTRANT DOTE D'AU MOINS DEUX CHAMBRES FILTRANTES | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 10.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.10.2003 | FI | 15.10.2003 | IE | 15.10.2003 | DK | 15.01.2004 | GR | 15.01.2004 | PT | 15.03.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 15.10.2003 | |
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 15.10.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 15.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4011419 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0569931 (KSB AG [DE]) |