EP1138646 - CARBONACEOUS REFRACTORY WITH HIGH RESISTANCE TO SPALLING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Osamu, Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
KURASHINA, Yukinobu, Shinagawa Refractories Co Ltd 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 03 /
TADA, Hidenori, Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 04 /
HOSHIYAMA, Yasuhiro, Shinagawa Refractories Co Ltd 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 05 /
TORIGOE, Atsushi, Shinagawa Refractories Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944813.7 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999JP05220 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0121544 | Date: | 29.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138646 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, C04B35/632, C04B35/043, C04B35/622 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
C04B35/013 (EP);
C04B35/00 (KR);
C04B35/043 (EP);
C04B35/103 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | C04B35/00, C04B35/632 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Title | German: | FEUERFESTES MATERIAL AUS KOHLENSTOFF MIT HOHER TEMPERATURWECHSELBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/40] | English: | CARBONACEOUS REFRACTORY WITH HIGH RESISTANCE TO SPALLING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2001/40] | French: | MATERIAU REFRACTAIRE CARBONE A RESISTANCE ELEVEE A LA THERMOCLASE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2001 | Translation filed | 25.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 14.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4315992 (GULS HANS-JUERGEN) [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract *; | [EY]JP2000109359 ; | [DY]JPS5232912 ; | [DA]EP0810188 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2044750 (MAGNESITAL FEUERFEST GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract * | [EY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000109359 A 20000418 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP; KUROSAKI REFRACT CO LTD) [EY] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * | [DY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 16, Database accession no. 1977-28337Y, XP002315534 & JPS5232912 A 19770312 (OSAKA YOGYO FIRE-BR) [DY] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * | International search | [XE]JP2968258B ; | [A]JPH09241067 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH06345525 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO); | [A]JPH0733513 (KUROSAKI REFRACTORIES CO, et al); | [A]JPH03197346 (HARIMA CERAMIC CO LTD, et al) |