EP1146974 - MACHINERY FOR AUTOMATED MANUFACTURE OF INNERSPRING ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sealy Technology LLC One Office Parkway Trinity, NC 27370 / US | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUBERT, Thomas, D. 274 Winthrop Road Columbus, OH 43214 / US | 02 /
SCHULER, Larry 22768 Cemetery Road Sugar Grove, OH 43155 / US | 03 /
BULLEN, Lawrence, C. 5711 County Road 13 Centerburg, OH 43011 / US | 04 /
SCOTT, K., Bryan 541 Hackberry Drive Westerville, OH 43081 / US | 05 /
YATES, Jan, B. 1081 Matterhorn Drive Reynoldsburg, OH 43068 / US | 06 /
HACKMAN, Donald, J. 3499 Kirkham Road Upper Arlington, OH 43221 / US | 07 /
EASTER, David, A. 254 E. College Avenue Westerville, OH 43081 / US | 08 /
HETTEBERG, John, R. 4169 Rowanne Road Columbus, OH 43214 / US | 09 /
FINGERHUTH, David 3750 Burnt Pond Road Ostrander, OH 43061 / US | 10 /
ALTEN, Alan, A. 2491 Musser Road Baltimore, OH 43105 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/43] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99945282.4 | 31.08.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999US19746 | Priority number, date | US19980151872 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: US 151872 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015369 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146974 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146974 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21F33/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B21F33/04 (EP,US);
B21F27/16 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/43] | B21F27/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN HERSTELLUNG VON FEDERKERNEN | [2001/43] | English: | MACHINERY FOR AUTOMATED MANUFACTURE OF INNERSPRING ASSEMBLIES | [2001/43] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE FABRICATION AUTOMATISEE D'ENSEMBLES A RESSORTS | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 29.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Request for further processing for: | 21.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4413659 (ZAENGERLE ERNST [CH]) [X] 1-55 * the whole document *; | [X]US5579810 (RAMSEY HENRY R [US], et al) [X] 1-55* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3469608 (KIRCHNER CARL O, et al); | [Y]US3918473 (RAMSEY HENRY R); | [X]US4014371 (WALKER BERTRAM, et al) |