EP1127222 - THREAD-CUTTING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ludwig Hettich & Co. Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 78713 Schramberg-Sulgen / DE | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HETTICH, Ulrich Rottweilerstrasse 22 D-78713 Schramberg / DE | 02 /
HETTICH, Stefan Haldenhof 18 D-78713 Schramberg/Sulgen / DE | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99945988.6 | 18.08.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999EP06029 | Priority number, date | DE1998219813U | 05.11.1998 Original published format: DE 29819813 U | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028225 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127222 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127222 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
F16B25/00 (EP,US);
F16B25/0026 (EP,US);
F16B25/0047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/49] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GEWINDESCHNEIDENDE SCHRAUBE | [2001/35] | English: | THREAD-CUTTING SCREW | [2001/35] | French: | VIS DE FILETAGE | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | DK | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | CY | 18.08.2003 | LU | 18.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/52] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 18.08.2003 | ||
LU | 18.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 18.08.2003 | ||
LU | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
CY | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 04.03.2003 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4439077 (GODSTED KENT B [US]) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,10; | [YDA]EP0623759 (HETTICH LUDWIG SCHRAUBENFAB [DE]) [YD] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [A] 7,10; | [YA]US5674035 (HETTICH STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * figures 1,2,15; claims 1,17 * [A] 7,10; | [YA]US5800107 (GIANNUZZI LOUIS N [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * figures 1,2,6-8 *[A] 7,10 |