EP1140235 - FIBRIN-BASED GLUE GRANULATE AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Correction of patent specification | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2008/22] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states ZLB Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states ZLB Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Aventis Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPP, Mirna Rotenberg 14 D-35037 Marburg / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/51] |
Former [2004/41] | Keller, Günter, Dr. Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99946186.6 | 17.09.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP06898 | Priority number, date | DE19981059611 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859611 | DE19991028372 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19928372 | DE19991028371 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19928371 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038752 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140235 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140235 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1140235 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1140235 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/10, A61L15/32, A61L15/42 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A61L24/106 (EP,KR);
A61L15/32 (EP,KR);
A61L2400/04 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FIBRINKLEBERGRANULAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/41] | English: | FIBRIN-BASED GLUE GRANULATE AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD | [2001/41] | French: | GRANULES DE COLLE DE FIBRINE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE GLATT Process Technology GmbH Bühlmühle 42 79589 Binzen / DE Opponent's representative Reitzle, Helmut, et al, et al Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | 02
28.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Ethicon Inc. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US Opponent's representative James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE GLATT Prozess Technology GmbH Bühlmühle 42 79589 Binzen / DE Opponent's representative Reitzle, Helmut, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | ||
02
28.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE Ethicon Inc. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US Opponent's representative James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 06.06.2003 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 11.06.2003 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.07.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.10.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.03.2005 | Appeal received No. T0327/05 | 30.05.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.07.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.08.2002 | GR | 28.08.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | DK | 28.11.2002 | PT | 11.12.2002 | MC | 01.04.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2005/21] | FI | 28.08.2002 | |
GR | 28.08.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 28.11.2002 | ||
PT | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GR | 28.08.2002 | |
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 28.11.2002 | ||
PT | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 28.08.2002 | |
DK | 28.11.2002 | ||
PT | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 28.08.2002 | |
PT | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 28.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4427651 (STROETMANN MICHAEL [DE]); | [X]US4453939 (ZIMMERMAN EBERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6-14,18-23 * column 2, lines 9-14 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]WO9728832 (NEW GENERATION MEDICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,6-14,18-20,22,23 * page 4, lines 22-25 * * claim - * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 11 * | Opposition | WO9744015 | WO0024436 |