EP1114565 - IMPROVED METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANGING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALSGAARD, Lars Torpantie 56 FIN-90230 Oulu / FI | 02 /
LUNDELL, Antero Rysäkatu 21 B 6 FIN-20900 Turku / FI | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
DALSGAARD, Lars Torpantie 56 FIN-90230 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
DALSGAARD, Lars Torpantie 56 FIN-90230 Oulu / FI | |||
Former [2001/28] | 01 /
DALSGAARD, Lars Toivoniementie 9 as FIN-90500 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
LUNDELL, Antero Lauklähteenkatu 7 G 55 FIN-20740 Turku / FI | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab Lentokatu 2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Kupiainen, Juhani c/o Oulun Patenttitoimisto, Berggren Oy Ab, Teknologiantie 14 D 90570 Oulu / FI | Application number, filing date | 99946191.6 | 16.09.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999FI00760 | Priority number, date | FI19980002000 | 16.09.1998 Original published format: FI 982000 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016581 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114565 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114565 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
H04W36/26 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (KR);
H04W48/08 (KR);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04W88/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/48] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN VON ZELLEN | [2001/28] | English: | IMPROVED METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANGING CELLS | [2001/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF AMELIORES DE CHANGEMENT DE CELLULES | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | DK | 26.02.2004 | GR | 26.02.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4850033 (EIZENHOEFER ALFONS [IE], et al); | [X]WO9507010 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL], et al); | [A]US5724665 (ABBASI SALMAN YOUSEF [US], et al) |