EP1039896 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR DELIVERING ZINC TO THE NASAL MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zicam, LLC 2375 East Camelback Road, Suite 500 Phoenix Arizona 85016 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Zicam, LLC 2375 East Camelback Road, Suite 500 Phoenix, Arizona 85016 / US | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Gel Tech, L.L.C. 6430 Variel Avenue, Suite 102B Woodland Hill, California 91367 / US | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Hensley, Charles 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | ||
For all designated states Davidson, Robert Steven 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | |||
For all designated states Kehoe, Gary S. 246 E. Watkins Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US | |||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Hensley, Charles 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | ||
For all designated states Davidson, Robert Steven 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hensley, Charles 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | 02 /
Davidson, Robert Steven 6430 Variel Avenue, No. 102 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | 03 /
Kehoe, Gary S. 246 E. Watkins Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US | [2002/09] |
Former [2000/40] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99946733.5 | 01.09.1999 | [2000/40] | WO1999US20185 | Priority number, date | US19980145042 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: US 145042 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012081 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039896 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/315, A61K9/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K31/315 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | A61K31/315 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON ZINK ZUM NASENMEMBRAN | [2000/40] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR DELIVERING ZINC TO THE NASAL MEMBRANE | [2000/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION PERMETTANT D'ADMINISTRER DU ZINC IONIQUE A UNE MEMBRANE NASALE | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 06.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2133691 (LEO AB) [X] 1,3,4 * claims 1,10,11 * * examples 1-9,12,13,16-30 *; | [X]WO8605988 (NASTECH PHARM CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,4 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 5 * * page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO8804929 (NASTECH PHARM CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO8804926 (NASTECH PHARM CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,2 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [X]EP0391342 (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,6,11 * * page 5, line 3 - line 6 * * examples 8-11 *; | [X]US5747058 (TIPTON ARTHUR J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * claims 1,2,68 ** column 20; table 16 * | International search | [Y]US5208031 (KELLY PATRICK D [US]) |