EP1121052 - IMAGING OF SURGICAL BIOPSIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCID, INC. 2320 Brighton-Henrietta Townline Road Rochester, NY 14623 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states LUCID, INC. 2320 Brighton-Henrietta Townline Road Rochester, NY 14623 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states LUCID, INC. 235 Middle Road Henrietta NY 14467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAVISLAN, James, M. 5 Wandering Trail Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 02 /
GREENWALD, Roger, J. 16787 Ridge Road Holley, NY 14470 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Baldus, Oliver Patentanwälte Schwarz & Baldus Hermann-Schmidstr. 10 80336 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/20] | Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99946898.6 | 13.09.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999US20997 | Priority number, date | US19980100179P | 14.09.1998 Original published format: US 100179 P | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0015021 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1121052 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121052 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, G01N1/36, G01N21/64, G02B21/00, // A61B10/00, G02B21/34 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G02B21/0024 (EP,US);
G01N1/36 (EP,US);
A61B10/0096 (EP,US);
G02B21/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | A61B5/05, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2018/30] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNG VON CHIRURGISCHEN BIOPSIEN | [2001/32] | English: | IMAGING OF SURGICAL BIOPSIES | [2001/32] | French: | IMAGERIE DE BIOPSIES CHIRURGICALES | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2003 | 30.09.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2004 | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2007 | 30.09.2009 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | IE | 13.09.2018 | LU | 13.09.2018 | FR | 25.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | GB | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | DE | 02.04.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
FR | 25.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
FR | 25.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
FR | 25.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
FR | 25.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
DE | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 13.09.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3480504 (GOOD DOROTHY I, et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 1, line 33 - line 34 * * column 2, line 1 - line 21 *; | [A]US5103338 (CROWLEY KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 2-4,8 * figures 4,7,8 *; | [XA]US5649547 (RITCHART MARK A [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 8, line 7 - line 12; figures 1,4 * * column 8, line 46 - line 63 * * column 9, line 8 - column 10, line 5 * [A] 4; | [X]US5271414 (PARTIKA LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 26 * * figure 7 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 2 *; | [A]US5076680 (ARJARASUMPUN NARONG [US]) [A] 1-4,7-10 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [A]US5073857 (PETERS RICHARD K [US], et al) [A] 2-4,8 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 49 *; | [X]US4415107 (PALMIERI BENIAMINO [IT]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 1, line 23 - line 40 * * column 2, line 3 - line 6 * * column 2, line 23 - line 26 * * column 2, line 40 - line 51 *; | [X]DE3323742 (KIELMANN JUERGEN) [X] 1,2 * page 4; figure 1 * * page 5 - page 6 *; | [A]US5554151 (HINCHLIFFE PETER W J [US]) [A] 4 * column 3, line 10 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0821256 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9908588 (LUCID INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * | International search | [XE]US5978695 (GREENWALD ROGER J [US], et al); | [AE]US6032071 (BINDER MICHAEL [AT]); | [AE]US6014451 (BERRY JAMES A [US], et al); | [AE]US5995867 (ZAVISLAN JAMES M [US], et al) | Examination | US4545831 | US5402460 | by applicant | US3480504 | US5649547 | US5103338 | US4545831 | WO9621938 | US5788639 | US5034613 | - JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (199506), vol. 104, no. 6, pages 1 - 7 | - "Optical characterization of disease tissue using low coherence interferometry", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (1993), vol. 1889 |