EP1150871 - ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Permo-Drive Research and Development Pty. Ltd. 203 Southern Cross Drive Ballina, NSW 2478 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Permo-Drive Research and Development Pty. Ltd. 59 Magelian Street Lismore, NSW 2480 / AU | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Permo-Drive Research and Development Pty. Ltd. 40 Habib Drive Lismore, NSW 2480 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRY, Michael 40 Habib Drive Lismore, NSW 2480 / AU | 02 /
KERR, Colin South Boambee Road Coffs Harbour, NSW 2450 / AU | 03 /
RUSH, Allan 65 Booerie Creek Road Lismore, NSW 2480 / AU | [2001/49] |
Former [2001/45] | 01 /
PERRY, Michael 40 Habib Drive Lismore, NSW 2480 / AU | ||
02 /
KERR, Colin South Boambee Road Coffs Harbour, NSW 2450 / AU | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Jenkins, Peter David PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99947102.2 | 03.09.1999 | [2001/45] | WO1999AU00740 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP05650 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: AU PP565098 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013952 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150871 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T10/04, B60T1/093, B60T1/10, F16D57/00, G01C23/00, B60K20/00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B60K6/12 (EP,US);
B60T1/10 (EP,US);
B60T10/04 (EP,US);
F16D57/06 (EP,US);
F16D61/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/45] | English: | ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2001/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION D'ENERGIE | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0047643 (ADVANCED ENERGY SYST [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11,15,18-20,29 * the whole document *; | [X]US4986383 (EVANS KENNETH W [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10,15,18,29,30* the whole document * | International search | [X]EP0047643 (ADVANCED ENERGY SYST [US]); | [X]US4986383 (EVANS KENNETH W [US]); | [X]WO9610806 (STACK LTD [GB], et al); | [X]DE19531766 (HOCHSCHORNER K W GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0863381 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) |