EP1139923 - UPPER LEG STUMP ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR AN EXOPROSTHETIC PROVISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESKA Implants GmbH & Co. Grapengiesserstrasse 34 23556 Lübeck / DE | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNDEI, Hans Hamburger Strasse 89 D-23558 Lübeck / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Christian Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Weiss, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Fuchs, Mehler, Weiss Patentanwälte, Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99947303.6 | 10.09.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP06676 | Priority number, date | DE1998157907 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857907 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035380 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139923 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139923 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28, A61F2/80 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/2814 (EP,US);
A61F2/80 (EP,US);
A61B17/72 (EP,US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/64 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2825 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3007 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3021 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30476 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30909 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5038 (EP,US);
A61F2002/607 (EP,US);
A61F2002/7887 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00011 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/29] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | OBERSCHENKELSTUMPF-ENDOPROTHESE FÜR EINE EXOPROTHETISCHE VERSORGUNG | [2001/41] | English: | UPPER LEG STUMP ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR AN EXOPROSTHETIC PROVISION | [2001/41] | French: | ENDOPROTHESE D'UN MOIGNON DE LA CUISSE POUR SOINS EXOPROTHETIQUES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 20.04.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4158895 (BRIGHT CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figures 2,3 ** column 3, line 20 - line 44 *; | [DA]DE4338746 (BEHR OTMAR DR [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 36 - line 47 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 51 - line 64 * * column 5, line 27 - line 34 *; | [A]DE9400720U (SCHREIBER HANS [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * claims 3,10,12 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * | by applicant | DE3125268 | EP0358056 | DE4106971 | DE4338746 |