EP1110203 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DIGITAL VOICE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kull, Hans 2 Kalkarra Cr. Mt Duneed, VIC 3216 / AU | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Betten & Resch Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99947314.3 | 10.09.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999EP06712 | Priority number, date | DE1998141683 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841683 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016310 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110203 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110203 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/02 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G10L13/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALEN SPRACHBEARBEITUNG | [2001/26] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DIGITAL VOICE PROCESSING | [2001/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT NUMERIQUE DE LA VOIX | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.08.2002 | GR | 14.08.2002 | IT | 14.08.2002 | NL | 14.08.2002 | LU | 10.09.2002 | BE | 30.09.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | DK | 14.11.2002 | SE | 14.11.2002 | PT | 02.12.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | MC | 01.04.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/44] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
LU | 10.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
SE | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
MC | 01.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
LU | 10.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
SE | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
LU | 10.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
DK | 14.11.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
GR | 14.08.2002 | ||
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 14.08.2002 | |
NL | 14.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 14.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9608813 (ARCADIA INC [JP], et al) [A] 1,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5559927 (CLYNES MANFRED [US]) [A] 1,19 * column 6, line 10 - line 26 * * column 7, line 45 - line 55 * * column 8, line 66 - column 10, line 37 *; | [AD]EP0762384 (AT & T CORP [US]) [AD] 1,19* abstract *; | [A]DE19610019 (DATA SOFTWARE GMBH G [DE]) [A] 1,19 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 29 * * page 8, line 9 - line 46 * * figures 1-3 *; | US5956685 [ ] (TENPAKU SEIICHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 6, line 36 - line 54; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 58; figures 9,15-17 * * claims 1,2 * |