EP1119774 - FREQUENCY RESPONSE ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Den Dulk, Gerard Feldstrasse 11 56414 Hundsangen / DE | For all designated states Schaumburg, Gerhard Schillerstr. 1 56410 Montabaur / DE | [2004/03] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Den Dulk, Gerard Feldstrasse 11 56414 Hundsangen / DE | ||
For all designated states Schaumburg, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 49 56412 Ruppach-Goldhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAUMBURG, Gerhard Schillerstr. 1 D-56410 Montabaur / DE | [2001/38] |
Former [2001/31] | 01 /
SCHAUMBURG, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 49 D-56412 Ruppach-Goldhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Jordan, Volker, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99947435.6 | 29.09.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999EP07218 | Priority number, date | DE1998145744 | 05.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19845744 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020875 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119774 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119774 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/16 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
G01R23/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/03] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FREQUENZGANGANALYSATOR | [2001/31] | English: | FREQUENCY RESPONSE ANALYZER | [2001/31] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE COURBES DE FREQUENCES | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0278669 (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS UK [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0841569 (MARCONI INSTRUMENTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]FR2448722 (ENERTEC) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0340021 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0268447 (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS UK [GB]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0153479 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |