EP1049080 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCING USING NEAR-FIELD LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUMI, Manabu Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 02 /
MITSUOKA, Yasuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 03 /
CHIBA, Norio Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 04 /
KASAMA, Nobuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Kenji Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 06 /
NIWA, Takashi Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99947937.1 | 15.10.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999JP05725 | Priority number, date | JP19980297377 | 19.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29737798 | [2000/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023989 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049080 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/004, G11B7/09, G11B7/135, G11B7/005, G11B7/0045, G11B7/013 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/1387 (EP,US);
G11B7/24085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | G11B7/004, G11B7/09, G11B7/135 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNG/-WIEDERGABE MITTELS NAHFELDLICHT | [2000/44] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCING USING NEAR-FIELD LIGHT | [2000/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE SERVANT A ENREGISTRER ET A REPRODUIRE DES INFORMATIONS AU MOYEN D'UNE LUMIERE DE CHAMP PROCHE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | Translation filed | 12.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 15.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07192280 ; | [X]EP0594193 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9,21,29 * abstract *; | [A]US5602820 (WICKRAMASINGHE HEMANTHA K [US], et al) [A] 3,4,23,24 * the whole document *; | [A] - HIGGINS D A ET AL, "Polarization-modulation near-field scanning optical microscopy of mesostructured materials", J. PHYS. CHEM. (USA), JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, 8 AUG. 1996, ACS, USA, (1996), vol. 100, no. 32, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 13794 - 13803, XP002289473 [A] 6,8,10,18,26,28,30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp9609951 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07192280 A 19950728 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 16 * abstract * | International search | [X]EP0376673 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [X]EP0552887 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [X]US5483508 (MIYAKE TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH09161338 (RICOH KK); | [X]JPH10112075 (SONY CORP); | [A] - BETZIG E. ET AL., "Polarization Contrast in Near-field Scanning Optical Mocroscopy", APPLIED OPTICS, (19920801), vol. 31, no. 22, pages 4563 - 4568, XP002926153 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.31.004563 |