EP1110233 - SCANNING ELECTRON BEAM MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA-Tencor Corporation 160 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134-1809 / US | [2016/03] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states KLA-Tencor Corporation 160 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134-1809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASNAGHETTI, Douglas, K. 1451 Corte De Rosa San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
CONCINA, Stefano, E. 1332 Bonnet Court San Jose, CA 95132 / US | 03 /
SUN, Stanley, S. 5106 Merano Court Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 04 /
NG, Waiman 331 Penn Way Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 05 /
ADLER, David, L. 6060 Guadalupe Mines Court San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Keane, Paul Fachtna FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Keane, Paul Fachtna FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Lukaszyk, Szymon, et al Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6 40-062 Katowice / PL | ||
Former [2012/07] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2001/26] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 99948130.2 | 02.09.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999US20384 | Priority number, date | US19980099050P | 03.09.1998 Original published format: US 99050 P | US19980149767 | 08.09.1998 Original published format: US 149767 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014765 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110233 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110233 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/29, H01J37/28 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H01J37/28 (EP,US);
H01J2237/004 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/03] |
Former [2004/22] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | RASTERELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP | [2001/26] | English: | SCANNING ELECTRON BEAM MICROSCOPE | [2001/26] | French: | MICROSCOPE A BALAYAGE PAR FAISCEAU ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2015 | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | [2017/42] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9832153 (KLA TENCOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * page 1, lines 28-35 * * page 12, lines 21-27 * * claim 1 * | Examination | US5412209 | - HIDEO NAKAGAWA ET AL, "A NOVEL HIGH-RESOLUTION SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPE FOR THE SURFACE ANALYSIS OF HIGH-ASPECT-RATIO THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, (19910901), vol. 30, no. 9A PART 01, doi:10.1143/JJAP.30.2112, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2112 - 2117, XP000263177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.30.2112 | - LEE K Y ET AL, "HIGH ASPECT RATIO ALIGNED MULTILAYER MICROSTRUCTURE FABRICATION", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AVS / AIP, MELVILLE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19941101), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1116/1.587525, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 3425 - 3430, XP000497168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.587525 | - NAKAMAE K ET AL, "Electron beam assisted high aspect ratio, submicrometre etching of passivation SiO2 on large-scale integrated circuits", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19921214), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:10.1088/0022-3727/25/12/002, ISSN 0022-3727, pages 1681 - 1686, XP020014175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/25/12/002 | by applicant | WO9832153 |