EP1117982 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING PRESSURE, FLOW AND CONSTRICTION PARAMETERS OF PLUMBING AND BLOOD VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Remon Medical Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 3533 38900 Caesarea Industrial / IL | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORAT, Yariv Harofe Street 5 34387 Haifa / IL | 02 /
TSALIAH, Yoseph Rahel Street 9 27000 Kiryat Bialik / IL | 03 /
DORON, Eyal Margalit Street 16 29500 Kiryat Yam / IL | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99948351.4 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US21777 | Priority number, date | US19980161658 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: US 161658 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019184 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117982 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/08, A61B8/12, A61B5/026, A61B5/0215, G01F1/36, G01F1/72 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/0535 (EP);
A61B5/0295 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/02158 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (EP,US);
A61B5/413 (EP,US);
G01F1/36 (EP,US);
G01F1/72 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | G01N11/08, A61B8/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER DRÜCK-, DURCHFLUSS- UND VERENGUNGSPARAMETER VON VERSORGUNGSLEITUNGEN UND BLUTGEFÄSSEN | [2001/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING PRESSURE, FLOW AND CONSTRICTION PARAMETERS OF PLUMBING AND BLOOD VESSELS | [2001/30] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DE PARAMETRES DE PRESSION, DE DEBIT ET DE CONSTRICTION DE CONDUITS ET DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9733513 (LIPOMATRIX INC [CH]); | [DXY]WO9829030 (BIOSENSE INC [US], et al); | [X]US5807258 (CIMOCHOWSKI GEORGE E [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4480483 (MCSHANE JAMES L [US]); | [X]US4680957 (DODD STEPHEN C [US]); | [Y]US5409009 (OLSON WALTER H [US]); | [A]US5705753 (HASTINGS CALVIN R [US], et al); | [AP]US5911685 (SIESS THORSTEN [DE], et al) |