EP1121174 - STENT DELIVERY PERFUSION CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael Barbados, West Indies / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLION, Douglas, P. 6262 Dallas Court Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Graalfs, Edo, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Graalfs, Edo, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | Graalfs, Edo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, et al Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99948438.9 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999US22165 | Priority number, date | US19980174283 | 16.10.1998 Original published format: US 174283 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023139 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121174 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121174 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02, A61F2/06 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1077 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2003/51] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PERFUSIONSKATHETER ZUM EINBRINGEN EINES STENTS | [2001/32] | English: | STENT DELIVERY PERFUSION CATHETER | [2001/32] | French: | CATHETER A PERFUSION POUR POSE DE STENT | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5772669 (VRBA ANTHONY C [US]) [A] 1-19,26 * column A; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5534007 (ST GERMAIN JON P [US], et al) [A] 1-19,26 * column A; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5571086 (KAPLAN AARON V [US], et al) [A] 1-19,26 * column A; figures 1-4D *; | [A]US5569184 (CROCKER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-19,26 * column A; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9313826 (NYCOMED INGENOR SA LAB [FR]) | by applicant | US5534007 | US5201757 | US5360401 | US19970941978 | US19970947619 | US19980071484 |