EP1121347 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 4-SUBSTITUTED N- (ALK-2- EN-1-YL)OXY]- AND N-ARALKYLOXY- 2,2,6,6- TETRAALKYLPIPERIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Spezialitätenchemie Holding AG (Ciba Spécialités Chimiques Holding SA) (Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc.) Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Ciba Spezialitätenchemie Holding AG (Ciba Spécialités Chimiques Holding SA) (Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc.) Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABIARZ, Joseph Edmund 41 Pinesbridge Road P.O. Box 653 Amawalk, NY 10501 / US | 02 /
PASTOR, Stephen Daniel 27 Crows Nest Lane - Unit 4F Danbury, CT 06810 / US | 03 /
CUNKLE, Glen Thomas 65 Malibu Road Stamford, CT 06903 / US | [2001/32] | Application number, filing date | 99948930.5 | 05.10.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999EP07365 | Priority number, date | US19980103951P | 13.10.1998 Original published format: US 103951 P | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021933 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121347 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121347 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/94 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
C07D211/94 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-SUBSTITUIERTE N-[(ALK-2-EN-1-YL)OXY]- UND N-ARALKYLOXY-2,2,6,6-TETRAALKYLPIPERIDINE | [2001/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 4-SUBSTITUTED N- (ALK-2- EN-1-YL)OXY]- AND N-ARALKYLOXY- 2,2,6,6- TETRAALKYLPIPERIDINES | [2001/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE N- (ALK-2-ENE-1-YLE)OXY]- ET DE N-ARALKYLOXY-2,2,6,6-TETRA-ALKYLPIPERIDINES 4-SUBSTITUEES | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2004 | CH | 07.07.2004 | CY | 07.07.2004 | FI | 07.07.2004 | LI | 07.07.2004 | IE | 05.10.2004 | LU | 05.10.2004 | DK | 07.10.2004 | GR | 07.10.2004 | SE | 07.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | PT | 07.12.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
CY | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.10.2004 | ||
LU | 05.10.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.10.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 07.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4921962 (GALBO JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0389430 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * example 2A *; | [A]EP0389419 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * example 21A *; | [AD] - CONNOLLY T J ET AL, "REACTIONS OF THE STABLE NITROXIDE RADICAL TEMPO. RELEVANCE TO LIVING FREE RADICAL POLYMERIZATIONS AND AUTOPOLYMERIZATION OF STYRENE", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, vol. 38, no. 7, ISSN 0040-4039, page 1133-1136, XP002057132 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(96)02461-6 | [AD] - CONNOLLY T J ET AL, "Photochemical Synthesis of TEMPO-capped Initiators for @?Living@? Free Radical Polymerization", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, vol. 37, no. 28, ISSN 0040-4039, page 4919-4922, XP004029548 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)00986-0 |