EP1129129 - A PROCESS FOR RECYCLING POWDER COATING FINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protol Powder Coatings Limited Triumph Trading Park, Vitesse Avenue, Speke Hall Road Liverpool L24 9GQ / GB | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILNER, Ian Triumph Trading Park,Vitesse Avenue Speke Hall Road, Liverpool L24 9GQ / GB | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Lyons, Andrew John, et al ROYSTONS, Tower Building, Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA, Merseyside / GB | Application number, filing date | 99949110.3 | 15.09.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999GB03072 | Priority number, date | GB19980020089 | 16.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9820089 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015705 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129129 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129129 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/00, // B65G47/16 , C09D5:03 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
C08J11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | C08J11/00, // C09D5:03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON PULVERLACKFEINGUT | [2001/36] | English: | A PROCESS FOR RECYCLING POWDER COATING FINES | [2001/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECYCLAGE DE FINES DE REVETEMENT PULVERULENT | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2004 | LU | 15.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | [2007/23] |
Former [2005/22] | MC | 30.09.2004 | |
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 14.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0683199 (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [X] 1-16 * entire document *; | [X]DE19703376 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [X] 1-8* claims 1-4,9,10,12 * |