EP1115877 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE CONSTRUCTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Limited Medawar Centre, Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Limited Medawar Centre, Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford 0X4 4GA / GB | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Oxford Biomedica (UK) Limited Medawar Centre, Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford 0X4 4GA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINLEY, Katie Mary 17 Demesne Furze, Headington Oxford OX3 7XF / GB | 02 /
NAYLOR, Stuart 64 Woodside Road Amersham, Bucks HP6 6AN / GB | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/29] | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99949142.6 | 22.09.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999GB03181 | Priority number, date | WO1998GB02885 | 23.09.1998 Original published format: PCT/GB98/02885 | GB19990001906 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: GB 9901906 | GB19990003538 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9903538 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017371 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115877 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1115877 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N15/86, C12N7/01, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, A61K48/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C12N15/63 (EP);
C12N15/113 (KR);
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N2710/10343 (EP);
C12N2740/13043 (EP);
C12N2830/00 (EP);
C12N2830/002 (EP);
C12N2830/008 (EP);
C12N2830/15 (EP);
C12N2830/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYNUCLEOTIDKONSTRUKTE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2001/29] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDE CONSTRUCTS AND USES THEREOF | [2001/29] | French: | PRODUITS DE RECOMBINAISON POLYNUCLEOTIDIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | GB | 22.09.2009 | IE | 22.09.2009 | LU | 22.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 22.09.2009 | ||
IE | 22.09.2009 | ||
LU | 22.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
IE | 22.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9521927 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9620276 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9815294 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9819695 (MODEX THERAPEUTIQUES [CH]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9831701 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9915684 (OXFORD BIOMEDICA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 5,8,9,12,15-22,25-31 * the whole document *; | [PX] - K. BOAST ET AL., "Characterization of physiologically regulated vectors for the treatment of ischemic disease", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC. PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, US, (19990901), vol. 10, no. 13, pages 2197 - 2208, XP000876772 [PX] 5,8,9,12,15-22,25-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430349950017185 | [A] - G U DACHS ET AL, "Targeting gene expression to hypoxic tumor cells", NATURE MEDICINE,US,NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, (19970501), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 515 - 520, XP002096343 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0597-515 | [DA] - K.M. LONERGAN ET AL., "Regulation of hypoxia-inducible mRNAs by the von Hippel-Lindau tumor suppressor protein requires binding to complexes containing elongins B/C and Cul2", MOL. CELL. BIOL., ASM WASHINGTON, DC,US, (199802), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 732 - 741, XP002130567 [DA] * the whole document * | [A] - K. BINLEY ET AL., "An adenoviral vector regulated by hypoxia for the treatment of ischaemic disease and cancer", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS, UK, (199610), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1721 - 1727, XP000876756 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301001 | [A] - MADAN A ET AL, "A 24-BASE-PAIR SEQUENCE 3' TO THE HUMAN ERYTHROPOIETIN GENE CONTAINS A HYPOXIA-RESPONSIVE TRANCRIPTIONAL ENHANCER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19930501), vol. 90, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3928 - 3932, XP000561802 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.9.3928 |