EP1123364 - DIESEL FUEL ADDITIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIESEL FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Energy Group, Inc. 1591 Fifth Avenue Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2001/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Edward, T. 836 N. Eighth Avenue Sturgeon Bay, WI 54235 / US | 02 /
FISHER, Richard 1221 East Donges Court Milwaukee, WI 53217 / US | 03 /
HERRO, Lewis 945 13th Street Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/33] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99949688.8 | 16.09.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999US21334 | Priority number, date | US19980156420 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: US 156420 | US19990377121 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: US 377121 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017293 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123364 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123364 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/14, C10L10/02 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
C10L10/02 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/1616 (EP,US);
C10L1/1852 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | DIESELBRENNSTOFFZUSATZSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIESELBRENNSTOFFEBEHANDLUNG | [2001/33] | English: | DIESEL FUEL ADDITIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIESEL FUELS | [2001/33] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ADDITIFS POUR CARBURANT DIESEL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE CARBURANTS DIESEL | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 16.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Request for further processing for: | 18.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.01.2007 | [2010/06] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB794586 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,14 * page 3, column 1 *; | [DA]US2930681 (BARUSCH MAURICE R) [DA] 1,8,12-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3658494 (DORER CASPER J JR) [DA] 1,5-8,10,12,14 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4443348 (WRIGHT JOHN H [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4516981 (NELSON JR OTIS L [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3631225 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-7,10,12,14 * page 3, line 37 - line 44 *; | [A]US4808195 (AMBROGIO SALVATORE [US]) [A] 1,5-12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5087268 (PARISH WALTER W [US]) [A] 1-7,10 * column 4; claims 3,7 *; | [DA]US5314511 (LIOTTA JR FRANK J [US], et al) [DA] 1,6,12-14* the whole document *; | [DA]US5425790 (LIOTTA JR FRANK J [US], et al) [DA] 1,6,7,10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5782936 (RILEY RICHARD A [US]) [DA] 1,8,14 * column 3, line 1 - line 47 * |