EP1117294 - MULTI-PART ANTI-MICROBIAL STERILIZATION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNTECH CORPORATION 14605 28th Avenue North Minneapolis, MN 55447 / US | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Mary, Beth 615 Upton Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55405 / US | 02 /
STANLEY, Patricia, M. 3701 Pillsbury Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US | 03 /
ONSTAD, Bradley, K. 11531 Kentucky Avenue North Champlin, MN 55316 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950033.3 | 30.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US22672 | Priority number, date | US19980102663P | 01.10.1998 Original published format: US 102663 P | US19980102664P | 01.10.1998 Original published format: US 102664 P | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0018228 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117294 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117294 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/00, A61L12/12, A61L12/14 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A61L2/186 (EP,US);
A01N37/16 (EP,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A61B1/00057 (EP,US);
A61B1/12 (EP,US);
A61B1/123 (EP,US);
A61B90/70 (EP,US);
A61L2/16 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
C23F11/04 (EP,US);
C23F11/08 (EP,US);
C23F11/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/16, A01N59/26, A01N43/647, A01N37/02, A01N25/30 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N59/26, A01N43/647, A01N37/16, A01N37/02, A01N25/30 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2001/30] | A01N37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIELTEILIGE ANTIMIKROBIELLE STERILISATIONSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN | [2001/30] | English: | MULTI-PART ANTI-MICROBIAL STERILIZATION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2001/30] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS DE STERILISATION ANTIMICROBIENNE EN PARTIES MULTIPLES | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2006 | BE | 25.01.2006 | CH | 25.01.2006 | CY | 25.01.2006 | FI | 25.01.2006 | IT | 25.01.2006 | LI | 25.01.2006 | NL | 25.01.2006 | DK | 25.04.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | ES | 06.05.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | GB | 30.09.2006 | LU | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | IE | 02.10.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
GB | 30.09.2006 | ||
LU | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
GB | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
GB | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 06.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5763378 (PAINTER JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 54 - line 67 * * column 17, line 58 - column 18, line 27 * * column 24, line 31 - line 39 * [A] 6-33; | [X]EP0851025 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5589507 (HALL II ROBERT T [US], et al); | [A]US5616616 (HALL II ROBERT T [US], et al); | [A]US5618841 (KROSS ROBERT [US]); | [A]US5635195 (HALL II ROBERT T [US], et al) |